MD HB868 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or before September 30, 2020, the Office of the Attorney General to post on its website an advisory protocol and voluntary training program for health care providers regarding how to respond to compulsory process requests for medical records; requiring and authorizing the Office to consult certain entities in developing the advisory protocol and voluntary training program; requiring the Office to track the traffic on its website beginning on September 30, 2020, to the extent practicable; etc.
Title
Medical Records – Compulsory Process Requests – Advisory Protocol and Voluntary Training Webinar
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {276384/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Attorney General
Clinics
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Dentists
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Nurses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Psychologists
Public Health
Records
Reports
Social Workers
Sunset
Advertising
Attorney General
Clinics
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Dentists
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Nurses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Psychologists
Public Health
Records
Reports
Social Workers
Sunset