MD HB885 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that it is a fraudulent insurance act for an individual surety to make a representation that it has legal authority to issue a contract of surety insurance or to issue a contract of surety insurance, except as provided in specified provisions of law; requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to conduct a specified analysis of practices of corporate sureties and individual sureties; requiring the Administration to consult with specified persons or entities; etc.
Title
Fraudulent Insurance Acts - Individual Sureties - Contracts of Surety Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (45-2) | |
2012-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-04-07 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-03-31 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments 993995/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-14 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Bankruptcy
Bonds
Contractors
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Fraud
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Licenses
Minorities
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Bonds
Contractors
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Fraud
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Licenses
Minorities
Penalties and Sentences
Reports