MD HB885 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from making, distributing, or selling a counterfeit airbag or a substandard airbag; prohibiting a person from installing a counterfeit airbag or a substandard airbag in a motor vehicle; prohibiting a person from selling or installing a device that causes the vehicle diagnostic system to inaccurately indicate that the airbag is functional when a counterfeit airbag or a substandard airbag is installed; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment - Prohibition on Counterfeit Airbags and Substandard Airbags
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn |
2013-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-14 | House | Reassigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-14 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Automotive Repair
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections