MD HB885 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB474
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to change the name of the Court of Appeals to be the Supreme Court of Maryland, to change the name of the Court of Special Appeals to be the Appellate Court of Maryland, to change the name of a Judge of the Court of Appeals to be a Justice of the Supreme Court of Maryland, and to change the name of the Chief Judge of the Court of Appeals to be the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court of Maryland; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Title
Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals – Renaming
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 83 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-10) |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB474 (Carry Over) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
SB666 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 82
SB666 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 82
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Clerks of Court
Constitutional Amendments
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Judges
Legislative Services, Department of
Names
Referendum
Clerks of Court
Constitutional Amendments
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Judges
Legislative Services, Department of
Names
Referendum
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
XVII - Quadrennial Elections | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
II - Executive Department | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
III - Legislative Department | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
III - Legislative Department | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
III - Legislative Department | 52 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 3A | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 41E | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 4B | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 5A | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
V - Attorney-General and State's Attorneys | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |