MD HB887 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a fiscal note for a bill to include an analysis of any potential long-term reduction in the expenditures of State government and of local governments and other long-term savings that could result from the bill; and requiring the analysis to project the potential long-term savings for a 5-year period beginning 1 year after the effective date of the bill.
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Analysis of Long-Term Savings
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] |
Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Tawanna Gaines [D] | Del. Carolyn Howard [D] | Del. Jolene Ivey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/8 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/1 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0887.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0887f.pdf |