MD HB892 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-04 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-04 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the homestead property tax credit applies to any State, county, or municipal corporation property tax and specified taxes imposed for specified bicounty commissions; specifying the applicable homestead credit percentage for specified taxes imposed for specified bicounty commissions; applying the Act to tax years beginning after June 30, 2010; etc.
Title
Property Taxes - Bicounty Commissions
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Del. Aisha Braveboy [D] | Del. Dereck Davis [D] |
Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Tawanna Gaines [D] | Del. Doyle Niemann [D] | Del. Justin Ross [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Special Order 4/8 (Senator Peters) Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2010-04-06 | Delegates Ross, Frick, and Bartlett | |
2010-04-06 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-06 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-04-06 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Mass Transit
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Special Tax Districts
Tax Credits
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Counties
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Mass Transit
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Special Tax Districts
Tax Credits
Washington Suburban Sanitary District