MD HB892 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from knowingly recruiting, harboring, transporting, or obtaining an individual for the purpose of appropriating the government benefits of an individual for the benefit of the person or another through deception, coercion, exploitation, isolation, or any other means; prohibiting a person from aiding, abetting, or conspiring with one or more persons to violate a certain provision of the Act; establishing that a violation of the Act is a felony; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Benefits Exploitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {573129/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Extortion
Food Stamps
Fraud
Identification
Medical Assistance
Penalties and Sentences
Physically Disabled Persons
Public Benefits
Retirement
Social Security
Threats
Veterans
Vulnerable Adults
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Extortion
Food Stamps
Fraud
Identification
Medical Assistance
Penalties and Sentences
Physically Disabled Persons
Public Benefits
Retirement
Social Security
Threats
Veterans
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |