MD HB9 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB141
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that equity be considered when State transportation plans, reports, and goals are developed; altering the membership of the advisory committee on State transportation goals; requiring the Maryland Department of Transportation to conduct transit equity analyses, cost-benefit analyses, and consult with certain communities before announcing or proposing any major service change or any reduction or cancellation of a certain capital expansion project in the construction program; etc.
Title
Equity in Transportation Sector - Guidelines and Analyses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583 |
2023-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-36) |
2023-04-07 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-12) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {823026/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-35) |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {443420/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2022-09-13 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB19 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
HB141 (Carry Over) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
HB141 (Carry Over) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Development
Construction
Demographics
Disabilities
Discrimination
internet
Language
Low-Income
Mass Transit
Minorities
Notices
Open Government
Reports
studies
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Development
Construction
Demographics
Disabilities
Discrimination
internet
Language
Low-Income
Mass Transit
Minorities
Notices
Open Government
Reports
studies
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 2 | 103.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 714 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |