MD HB901 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Department of the Environment jointly to conduct a study, in consultation with specified county boards of health, regarding fluoridation levels in public drinking water in the State and to report their findings and analysis to the General Assembly on or before September 30, 2012.
Title
Departments of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Environment - Fluoride Levels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2011-02-28 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Environment, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Reports
Water
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Reports
Water
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0901.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0901f.pdf |