MD HB901 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified buildings owned by the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to be high performance buildings under specified circumstances; exempting specified building types from specified high performance building standards; authorizing the Commission to request specified waivers from specified high performance building standards; authorizing a county council, with approval of the county executive, to issue a specified waiver under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - High Performance Buildings
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-03-17 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-06 | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Building Codes
Committees and Commissions
Construction
County Councils
Environmental Matters
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Committees and Commissions
Construction
County Councils
Environmental Matters
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Washington Suburban Sanitary District