MD HB901 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring 3% of the hotel tax revenue generated in the City of Annapolis to be distributed to a special fund to be used only to fund the Annapolis Art in Public Places Commission; requiring 3% of the hotel tax revenue generated in the City of Annapolis to be distributed to a certain fund for housing assistance payments; requiring the Commission to report by November 1 each year on its use of the hotel tax revenue during the preceding fiscal year to the Mayor and the City Council and to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518 |
2021-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {649237/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {425360/1 Adopted |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB529 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 519
Subjects
Annapolis
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Local Government Mandates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 20 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |