MD HB908 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain notice requirements that a supplier of water must give to the Department of the Environment and certain individuals and entities under certain circumstances; requiring a supplier of water to give notice to the Department of the Environment and the Maryland Department of Emergency Management if there is a positive test for E. coli in the system and immediately begin certain preparations; requiring each community water system to ensure that certain testing is performed on water provided by the system; etc.
Title
Environment - Suppliers of Water - Notification Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Counties
Electronic Communication
Emergency Management, Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Higher Education
News Media
Notices
Publications
Radio
Students
Telephones
Television
Utilities
Water
Water Pollution
Counties
Electronic Communication
Emergency Management, Department of
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Higher Education
News Media
Notices
Publications
Radio
Students
Telephones
Television
Utilities
Water
Water Pollution
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |