MD HB931 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide a specified reimbursement for services delivered by telemedicine under specified circumstances; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations for a specified purpose.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-0) (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {986289/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology