MD HB931 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1550
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the designee of the State Superintendent of Schools, on receipt of a certain notification of a certain allegation of child abuse or neglect, to ensure that a certain notice is provided; requiring a certain family child care provider or child care center to provide a certain notice to certain parents and guardians within 24 hours after first having knowledge of a certain report or incident of suspected child abuse or neglect; prohibiting a person from providing the notice under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Child Care Providers - Notice of Allegations of Child Abuse or Neglect (Aiden's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {548075/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB1550 (Carry Over) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Family Law
Investigations and Inquiries
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Public Officials
Reports
Time
Child Care
Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Family Law
Investigations and Inquiries
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Public Officials
Reports
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 5 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 418 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 419 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 5 | 419.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 705.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |