MD HB937 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the appointment of one commissioner by the President of the Senate and and one commissioner by the Speaker of the House of Delegates to the Public Service Commission; specifying the term of a commissioner, based on staggered terms that take effect on June 1, 2016; etc.
Title
Public Service Commission - Commissioners - Selection and Term
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-19 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2016-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Ballots
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Oaths
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Public Officials
Public Service Commission
Utility Regulation
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Oaths
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Public Officials
Public Service Commission
Utility Regulation