MD HB944 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-02 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-02 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified distributors, on or before January 1, 2012, to establish a program for the collection and recycling of specified beverage containers; requiring specified owners and managers of bars and restaurants, beginning January 1, 2012, to separate, store, and arrange for the collection and recycling of specified beverage containers; requiring the Department of the Environment to provide specified financial assistance to distributors for establishing a specified recycling program; etc.
Title
Recycling - Bars and Restaurants - Beverage Containers
Sponsors
Del. Saqib Ali [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Sue Hecht [D] |
Del. Doyle Niemann [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-02 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-02 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-02 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Beverage Containers
Counties
Dealers
Environment, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Recycling
Reports
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Beverage Containers
Counties
Dealers
Environment, Department of
Municipal Corporations
Recycling
Reports
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0944.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0944f.pdf |