MD HB944 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 437
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 437
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program in the Department of Education; authorizing the Department to provide grants to local jurisdictions or child care licensing regions to increase the supply and ensure the sustainability of family child care providers in areas with above average rates of poverty and unemployment; requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly by December 1, 2021, and each year thereafter, on the status of the program and an evaluation of local pilot programs; etc.
Title
Growing Family Child Care Opportunities Pilot Program – Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 437 |
2021-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-9) |
2021-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {724836/1 Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-4) |
2021-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {305969/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB711 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 438
Subjects
Appropriations
Child Care
Children
Commerce and Business
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Grants
Human Relations
Licenses
Minorities
Partnerships
Poverty
Reports
Rural Areas
Small Business
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unemployment
Urban Areas
Women
Child Care
Children
Commerce and Business
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, State Department of
Grants
Human Relations
Licenses
Minorities
Partnerships
Poverty
Reports
Rural Areas
Small Business
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unemployment
Urban Areas
Women