MD HB948 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Office of the Inspector General and an Advisory Board for the Office; establishing that the Advisory Board has the powers to appoint and remove the Inspector General; providing for the position, term, qualifications, and authority of the Inspector General; providing that certain records are not subject to disclosure; providing that disclosure of a protected record is a misdemeanor; authorizing the Inspector General to adopt regulations to carry out the Act; requiring certain reports; etc.
Title
Maryland Office of the Inspector General – Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Auditors and Audits
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Continuing Education
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Ethics
Evidence
Fines
Fraud
General Assembly
Governor
Identification
Inspections
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Managers and Supervisors
meetings
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Information
Public Officials
Publications
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Documents
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Auditors and Audits
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Continuing Education
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Ethics
Evidence
Fines
Fraud
General Assembly
Governor
Identification
Inspections
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Managers and Supervisors
meetings
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Information
Public Officials
Publications
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Documents
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 7.5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7.5 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7.5 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7.5 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7.5 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7.5 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7.5 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7.5 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7.5 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7.5 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7.5 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 7.5 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |