MD HB961 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB52
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a municipality, a county, or any other political subdivision from adopting or enforcing a local law prohibiting or regulating the sale of lemonade or other nonalcoholic beverages by individuals under the age of 18 from a stand on private property.
Title
Local Government - Lemonade Stands - Prohibition on Regulation by Local Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB52 (Carry Over) 2020-01-08 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Counties
Fees
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Local Government - Generally
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Rules and Regulations
Transient Merchants
Counties
Fees
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Local Government - Generally
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Rules and Regulations
Transient Merchants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 1 | 1314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |