MD HB964 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-05 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-05 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making specified stormwater management regulations adopted by the Department of the Environment applicable to all new development and redevelopment projects that do not have final approval for erosion and sediment control and stormwater management plans by May 4, 2020; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Environment - Stormwater Management - New Development and Redevelopment
Sponsors
Sen. Gail Bates [R] | Del. Wendell Beitzel [R] | Del. Norman Conway [D] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] |
Del. D Page Elmore [R] | Del. Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio [D] | Del. Richard Impallaria [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-05 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-02 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-02 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-03-02 | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-02 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Construction
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Erosion
Flood Control
Rules and Regulations
Sediment Control
Zoning and Planning
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Erosion
Flood Control
Rules and Regulations
Sediment Control
Zoning and Planning
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0964.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0964f.pdf |