MD HB964 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to $8,000,000 the limit on the total amount of grants that may be distributed to community colleges to provide instruction and services to specified students enrolled in English for Speakers of Other Languages programs.
Title
Community Colleges - Grants for English for Speakers of Other Languages Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-25) (Y: 113 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-8) (Y: 128 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-8) (Y: 128 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 658 |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-25) |
2013-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {269134/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-8) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate McDonough) Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {925761/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-11 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Grants
Higher Education
Language
Students
Baltimore City
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Grants
Higher Education
Language
Students