MD HB972 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Real Estate Trust Money Distribution; providing for the membership, composition, chair and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the workgroup to study certain issues including the timely disposition of deposit money when a dispute arises between buyer and seller; and requiring the Workgroup to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2021, recommendations for any legislation needed to clarify the manner in which real estate trust money is distributed.
Title
Real Estate - Workgroup to Study Real Estate Trust Money Distribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-41) |
2021-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {743095/1 Adopted |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Committees and Commissions
Estates and Trusts
Examinations
Labor, Department of
Real Estate
Real Property
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Estates and Trusts
Examinations
Labor, Department of
Real Estate
Real Property
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Occupations and Professions | 17 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 17 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 17 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |