MD HB976 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 986
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 986
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the County Commissioners of Somerset County to appropriate to certain organized volunteer fire companies in the county certain amounts for fiscal years 2025 through 2030; and requiring that the appropriations required for fiscal year 2030 remain in effect for subsequent fiscal years unless altered by a future enactment.
Title
Somerset County - Fire Companies - Appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 986 |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB829 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 987
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Somerset County | 2 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |