MD HB98 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-14 - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-14 - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Deafblind Co-Navigation Services Program in the Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing to provide co-navigation services at no cost to deafblind individuals in the State; and defining Co-Navigation Services as services providing visual and environmental information or sighted services to assist with communication accessibility in an individual's preferred language and communication mode, and to assist with accessing an individual's physical surroundings and making informed decisions about those surroundings.
Title
Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Deafblind Co-Navigation Services Program - Established
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2023-10-27 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB185 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-29 - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Disabled
Hearing Aids
Language
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Deaf Persons
Disabled
Hearing Aids
Language
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 2401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 2438 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 2439 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 2440 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 2441 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 2442 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 2443 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0098?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0098f.pdf |