MD HB997 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to install and activate a video recording device in specified police vehicles; requiring the Administration to post a specified notice on each police vehicle equipped with a video recording device; limiting to specified persons and for specified purposes the review of any video recording that is made in police vehicles used by Administration police officers engaged in official duties; requiring the Administration, in cooperation with the Office of the Attorney General, to adopt regulations; etc.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Police Vehicles - Video Recording Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn | |
2010-02-16 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-15 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Equipment
Law Enforcement
Mass Transit
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Privacy
Recordings
Rules and Regulations
Video
Attorney General
Equipment
Law Enforcement
Mass Transit
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Privacy
Recordings
Rules and Regulations
Video
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0997.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0997f.pdf |