MD SB1000 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain practitioner to dispose of the body of a decedent by cremation if the practitioner receives a certain authorizing document; prohibiting a certain practitioner from requesting or soliciting the consent of certain persons or considering the objection of certain persons to the cremation of a certain body before cremating a certain body if the practitioner received a certain document; etc.
Title
Funeral Directors, Morticians, and Crematory Operators - Disposition of Body by Cremation - Requirement and Liability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cremation
Estates and Trusts
Fraud
Funerals
Health Occupations
Liability
Morticians
Notices
Public Health
Records
Cremation
Estates and Trusts
Fraud
Funerals
Health Occupations
Liability
Morticians
Notices
Public Health
Records