MD SB1001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, for fiscal year 2017, county boards of education shall be relieved of a specified portion of a contribution for specified local employees of the Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems; providing for a specified allocation of payment relief; requiring the Governor to provide a specified amount in either fiscal year 2018 or 2019 to be paid into specified accumulation funds of the State Retirement and Pension System if a specified condition is not met; etc.
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - County Boards of Education Payments
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. Edward Kasemeyer [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. Thomas Miller [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-2) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (119-14) (Y: 119 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (119-14) (Y: 119 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2) |
2017-03-24 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (119-14) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments {634860/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 10:00 a.m. |
2017-03-24 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {499337/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Counties
Education, Boards of
Governor
Retirement Systems
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Counties
Education, Boards of
Governor
Retirement Systems
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers