MD SB1002 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Recommit to Committee Budget and Taxation (Senator Brinkley)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Recommit to Committee Budget and Taxation (Senator Brinkley)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Broadening the scope of satellite simulcast betting on horse races to include instant racing; and specifying that instant racing involves a bettor viewing a self-serve totalizator machine that displays a previously run horse race in digitized form and specified information before and after the race.
Title
Satellite Simulcast Betting - Instant Horse Racing Machines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Recommit to Committee Budget and Taxation (Senator Brinkley) | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-03-05 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-22 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB1002.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb1002f.pdf |