MD SB1006 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (114-20)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (114-20)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a hospital, under certain circumstances, to sell the medical debt of patients if the debt is sold to a governmental unit or an entity that is under contract with the unit for the purpose of canceling the debt; requiring that a hospital's financial policy require the hospital to dismiss actions pending against a patient for the collection of debt that was sold and prohibit the hospital from engaging in specified collection activities; requiring a purchaser of medical debt to notify the patient of certain information; etc.
Title
Hospitals - Medical Debt Collection - Sale of Patient Debt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-20) |
2024-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {333820/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-16 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {103927/1 Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Contracts
Debt Collection
Emergency Bills
Federal Aid
Federal Government
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Patients
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Contracts
Debt Collection
Emergency Bills
Federal Aid
Federal Government
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Patients
Reports
Safety
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 214.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |