MD SB1008 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a fire department, a rescue squad, or an ambulance service from conducting a criminal history records check or requiring an applicant to disclose criminal records before the applicant's first in-person interview; requiring each fire department, rescue squad, and ambulance service to establish a certain peer review committee; and establishing the duties of a peer review committee.
Title
Public Safety - Criminal History Records Check - Fire Departments, Rescue Squads, and Ambulance Services
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB586 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Ambulances
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Fire Protection
Public Safety
Rescue Squads
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Disclosure
Fire Protection
Public Safety
Rescue Squads
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 6 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1008?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1008f.pdf |