MD SB1014 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, with respect to a homeowners association, a declarant and its affiliates from voting to elect the governing body of a homeowners association at a specified meeting to elect the governing body.
Title
Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Election of Governing Body
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn | |
2012-03-01 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-20 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB1014.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb1014f.pdf |