MD SB1040 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to 3.5% the maximum rate a county may impose on an individual's Maryland taxable income for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021; requiring a county, with regard to any increase to its county income tax rate that is effective on or after January 1, 2022, to impose the increase on an income bracket basis; requiring a county that imposes the county income tax on an income bracket basis to set, by ordinance or resolution, certain income brackets; etc.
Title
Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1494 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1040?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1040f.pdf |