MD SB1049 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified provisions of law requiring a specified property owner or manager of an apartment building or a council of unit owners of a condominium to provide for recycling for its residents do not apply in Ocean City.
Title
Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean City
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-25) (Y: 114 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-25) |
2013-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {304236/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |