MD SB1049 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to grant specified county boards of education specified adjustments and exceptions for school attendance if attendance is prevented on a day that the Governor declares a state of emergency; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Education - Required Number of School Days - Exception
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Getty [R] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] |
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-05 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-04-03 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2014-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {814239/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |