MD SB1053 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a contingency on provisions of law that authorize specified depository institutions and credit unions to conduct savings promotion raffles; altering the circumstances under which depository institutions may conduct savings promotion raffles; requiring a depository institution or credit union offering a savings promotion raffle to post and disclose in specified materials a statement describing the terms and conditions of the raffle; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions - Credit Unions and Depository Institutions - Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments 687578/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-07 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Advertising
Banks and Trust Companies
Credit Unions
Disclosure
Federal Government
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Notices
Raffles
Savings and Loan Associations
Banks and Trust Companies
Credit Unions
Disclosure
Federal Government
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Notices
Raffles
Savings and Loan Associations