MD SB1065 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to appropriate certain amounts of money to the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra in fiscal years 2022 through 2026; requiring the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra to submit certain reports to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before October 15 each year, beginning in 2022 and for the next 4 years; and repealing the termination of a certain provision of law requiring the Governor to appropriate a certain amount of money to the Baltimore Symphony Orchestra in fiscal years 2020 and 2021.
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Symphony Orchestra - Funding and Reporting
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-29) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-3) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1658 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Appropriations
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Budgets
Economic and Community Development
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Time
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Budgets
Economic and Community Development
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Economic Development | 4 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |