MD SB1079 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Worcester County Board of License Commissioners to issue a Class D beer, wine and liquor license within the corporate limits of the Town of Berlin or the corporate limits of the Town of Snow Hill.
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2014-03-21 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Mathias) {793121/1 Adopted |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {924738/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Municipal Corporations
Worcester County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
License Commissioners, Boards of
Municipal Corporations
Worcester County