MD SB11 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting to $150 the fee that may be charged for a food processing plant license under specified provisions of law to specified civic and nonprofit organizations that process meat for human consumption no more than three times a year for 5 days or less each time.
Title
Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Civic and Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Young [D] | Sen. Barry Glassman [R] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Christopher Shank [R] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-03-25 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-25 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {847279/1 Report Adopted |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-08-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |