MD SB11 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB38
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that each member of the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County be a resident and voter of Baltimore County.
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Qualifications
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB11 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Economic Matters
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Baltimore County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Residency
Voting
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Baltimore County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Residency
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 13 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 13 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 13 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |