MD SB1101 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB949
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of an eligible institution for the Maryland Police Officers and Probation Agents Scholarship Program to include a community college in the State.
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Police Officers and Probation Agents Scholarship Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Jack Bailey [R] | Sen. Mary James [D] | Sen. Chris West [R] |
Sen. Mike McKay [R] | Sen. William Folden [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 10:45 a.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {783721/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB949 (Carry Over) 2022-04-05 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Certifications
Community Colleges
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
dependents
Emergency Bills
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Parole and Probation
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Racial Matters
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Tuition
Community Colleges
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
dependents
Emergency Bills
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Parole and Probation
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Racial Matters
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Tuition
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 18 | 3801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 18 | 3802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |