MD SB1109 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning to administer any community service employment programs delegated to the State under Title V of the federal Older Americans Act of 1965; requiring the responsibility for carrying out the Senior Community Service Employment Program to be transferred to the Division on July 1, 2016; requiring that specified appropriations be transferred to the Division on July 1, 2016; etc.
Title
Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Transfer of Senior Community Service Employment Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-05 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2016-03-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Aging, Department of
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Education
Elderly
Federal Government
Forms
Records
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Education
Elderly
Federal Government
Forms
Records
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment