MD SB1141 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rereferred to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rereferred to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that applicants for a Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship are not subject to certain requirements of the scholarship application process if the applicant enrolls in a noncredit vocational certificate program, enrolls in a sequence of noncredit courses leading to licensure or certification, or participates in a registered apprenticeship program.
Title
Community Colleges - Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2024-04-03 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {963821/1 Adopted |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB607 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Subjects
Apprentices
Certifications
Community Colleges
Forms
Higher Education
Licenses
Residency
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Secondary Schools
Certifications
Community Colleges
Forms
Higher Education
Licenses
Residency
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Secondary Schools