MD SB1143 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-14)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-14)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Neshante and Chloe Davis Domestic Violence Prevention Task Force; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly regarding domestic violence prevention strategies and policies on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Title
Neshante and Chloe Davis Domestic Violence Prevention Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-04-11 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2016-03-31 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {528276/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Domestic Violence
Family Law
General Assembly
Health
Prince George's County
Public Safety
Reports
Social Services
Sunset
Domestic Violence
Family Law
General Assembly
Health
Prince George's County
Public Safety
Reports
Social Services
Sunset