MD SB1145 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring law enforcement agencies and State's Attorneys to notify schools of certain information when a child is arrested for a sexual offense in the third degree; prohibiting a child from in-person attendance at a public school or a nonpublic school that receives State funds if the child has been convicted or adjudicated delinquent of rape or other sexual offenses; and requiring each local school system to provide alternative educational options for children prohibited from in-person attendance under the Act.
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Child Sex Offenders - Prohibition on In-Person Attendance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2024-03-27 | House | Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred Ways and Means Judiciary |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {833427/1 Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 9:30 a.m. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2024-02-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1493 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-15 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Arrests
Criminal Law - Procedures
Education, Boards of
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Remote and Hybrid Education
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Criminal Law - Procedures
Education, Boards of
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Remote and Hybrid Education
Sexual Offenses
State's Attorneys
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 722 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |