MD SB115 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB339
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a petitioner for a recount to select the method for conducting the recount; limiting the methods from which the selection must be made; requiring a local board of elections to preserve and store certain voter-verifiable paper records in a certain manner and count the voter-verifiable paper record in a manual recount after a certain review; and establishing the process for an automated recount.
Title
Election Law – Recounts – Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {613726/1 Adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-09-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB339 (Carry Over) 2023-03-06 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
HB371 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
HB371 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Subjects
Absentee and Mail-In Ballots
Ballots
Data
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Ethics
Open Government
Records
Safety
Storage
Voting
Ballots
Data
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Emergency Bills
Equipment
Ethics
Open Government
Records
Safety
Storage
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 12 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 9 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |