MD SB1159 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor, when evaluating an applicant for membership on the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City, to consider the need for geographic, political, racial, ethnic, cultural, and gender diversity on the Board; requiring the Governor to make an appointment to fill a vacancy on the Board within 15 days after the vacancy occurs; repealing the requirement that the Governor appoint all of the members of the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City; etc.
Title
Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners - Members - Terms and Appointment
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Lisa Gladden [D] |
Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-46) (Y: 90 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-2) (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-2) (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-46) |
2016-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-22 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-2) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {904636/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {904636/1 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2016-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Baltimore City
Commerce and Business
Court of Appeals
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Ethnic Affairs
Governor
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minorities
Political Parties
Public Officials
Secretary of State
Time
Women
Baltimore City
Commerce and Business
Court of Appeals
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Ethnic Affairs
Governor
Hearings
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minorities
Political Parties
Public Officials
Secretary of State
Time
Women