MD SB1161 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission on June 1, 2024 to open a revised Round 2 proceeding to evaluate certain offshore wind projects; authorizing certain offshore wind projects to submit certain revised plans for project schedules, sizes, or pricing, including offshore wind renewable energy credit pricing and, under certain circumstances, to seek approval from the Commission to increase the maximum amount of offshore wind renewable energy credits sold under a certain order, subject to certain limitations; etc.
Title
Electricity - Offshore Wind Projects - Alterations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1296 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Subjects
Clean Energy Credits
Energy
Energy Administration
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of the
Forms
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Wind Energy
Energy
Energy Administration
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of the
Forms
Natural Resources, Department of
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Reports
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Wind Energy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 704.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1161?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb1161f.pdf |