MD SB133 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from 30 days to 60 days, the time period during which an investigation must be conducted and a written decision must be issued regarding a complaint filed by an applicant or employee alleging discrimination or harassment by an employer; and authorizing an extension of the time period by up to an additional 30 days if the applicant or employee who filed the complaint provides written authorization to the equal employment officer investigating the complaint.
Title
State Employee Rights and Protections - Personnel Actions and Harassment - Investigation of Complaints
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-11) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {383828/1 Adopted |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-10) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {343323/1 Adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2023-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB62 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Subjects
Discrimination
Harassment
Investigations and Inquiries
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Harassment
Investigations and Inquiries
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 5 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 5 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |