MD SB138 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $250,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Dorchester County Family YMCA, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Dorchester County Family YMCA building, located in Dorchester County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Dorchester County Family YMCA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Dorchester County
Public Works, Board of
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Dorchester County
Public Works, Board of
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)