MD SB140 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law related to the adoption of a plumbing code in St. Mary's County.
Title
St. Mary's County - Local Plumbing Code - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |